Financial history HAZEL COURTS SCHOOL

Charity number: 1095440
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £8.18k £16.64k £62.69k £5.60k £25.36k
Total expenditure £14.14k £16.06k £19.70k £60.34k £24.69k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A £0