Accounts and annual returns VICTIM SUPPORT WEST MIDLANDS

Charity Number: 1091444
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 21 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 05 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 05 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 14 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 24 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 29 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 July 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 17 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 22 August 2005 On Time