Financial history ROBERTSWOOD SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1091179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £66.43k £84.14k £27.78k £58.79k £48.02k
Total expenditure £65.79k £74.81k £37.73k £46.45k £33.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A