Accounts and annual returns GRASSROOTS ACTION

Charity Number: 1091516
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2020 24 December 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required