Accounts and annual returns ROBERT OWEN COMMUNITIES CORNWALL

Charity Number: 1091884
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 18 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 15 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 07 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 28 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required