Financial history ASHFORD BOROUGH COMMUNITY ARTS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1092833
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £394 £437 £2.54k £1.91k £0
Total expenditure £15 £15 £1.64k £1.13k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A