Financial history THE MIDLAND SINFONIA

Charity number: 1095563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £12.04k £776 £3.63k £16.35k £16.86k
Total expenditure £6.87k £494 £7.80k £13.76k £16.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 N/A N/A N/A N/A