Accounts and annual returns WITHINGTON HEDGEHOG CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1092015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2023 344 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 March 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 June 2021 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required