Trustees THE KANJI PROJECT

Charity number: 1090901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sofie Franzen Chair 07 April 2014
None on record
Lesley Marilyn Arend Trustee 11 January 2024
None on record
Benjamin Nicholas Skinner Trustee 17 June 2023
None on record
Peter John Dacombe Trustee 29 August 2020
None on record
Jennifer Cruse Trustee 14 September 2019
None on record
George William Foden Trustee 05 May 2017
None on record
VERONICA ROSE CLARK Trustee
None on record
Alison Louise Worgan Trustee
None on record