Accounts and annual returns AIRBORNE FORCES CHARITIES

Charity number: 1090978
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 27 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 27 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 02 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 02 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 26 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 27 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 29 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 29 August 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 06 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 06 October 2005 On Time