Financial history TRAVEL AID

Charity Number: 1092061
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011
Total gross income £25.50k £29.30k £79.59k £92.29k £19.71k
Total expenditure £22.08k £16.36k £67.97k £74.53k £37.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A