Accounts and annual returns STEP:UP (EDUCATING THROUGH OPPORTUNITY)

Charity number: 1094019
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 14 March 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 08 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 18 June 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 17 July 2009 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 24 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2007 22 October 2008 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 05 November 2008 128 days late