Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF SOUTHWAY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1091794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 13 August 2022 05 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 13 August 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 13 August 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 13 August 2019 08 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 August 2019 Not Required