Accounts and annual returns WILTON PRODUCTIONS

Charity number: 1095110
Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 09 December 2024 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 10 September 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 02 September 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 12 March 2021 193 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 18 May 2021 260 days late Download Open in new window