Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF LEONARD STANLEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1094995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 25 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 08 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 11 December 2023 134 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required