Financial history STARCREST CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1092591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £23.83k £24.21k £24.95k £8.69k £19.13k
Total expenditure £20.15k £24.00k £25.25k £9.65k £18.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A