Accounts and annual returns BOWNESS ON SOLWAY PA

Charity number: 1091911
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 10 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 10 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 01 October 2023 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 06 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required