Financial history WAKEFIELD VISUALLY IMPAIRED GROUP

Charity Number: 1093772
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £1.82k £3.60k £667 £854 £699
Total expenditure £2.77k £2.58k £1.69k £808 £623
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A