Financial history REJESUS

Charity number: 1093647
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £4.37k £4.26k £246 £240 £240
Total expenditure £9.68k £3.17k £3.36k £544 £4.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A