Accounts and annual returns WORTHING AND DISTRICT CROSSROADS - CARING FOR CARERS

Charity number: 1092624
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 16 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 22 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 09 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 August 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 15 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 17 July 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 14 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 24 November 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 31 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 30 October 2004 On Time