Trustees HAMSEY SCHOOL PTA
Charity number: 1094000

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL MARTIN COOPER | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA TULLETT | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Scarr | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Mutsumi Bates | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Bates | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Opeoluwa Ojeniyi | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sally Miller | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Fletcher | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Civardi | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rose Buldum | Trustee | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Donna Shilling | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tamsyn D Arienzo | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.