Accounts and annual returns JOLLY JUNIORS PLAYSCHEME

Charity number: 1093148
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2005 30 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2004 07 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2004 Not Required