Financial history GAMBIA LINK

Charity number: 1093451
Charity reporting is overdue by 1489 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £7.37k £5.37k £6.10k £5.87k £3.19k
Total expenditure £6.52k £5.63k £5.79k £6.07k £3.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A