Accounts and annual returns CYMDEITHAS RIENI YSGOL CORN HIR / YSGOL CORN HIR PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1093312
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2008 22 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2007 21 July 2008 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required