Accounts and annual returns BESSIE AND GEORGE BALL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1093584
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2007 04 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2007 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2006 25 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2006 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2005 28 February 2006 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2005 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2004 16 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2004 Not Required