Accounts and annual returns MEMPHIS TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1094531
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | 10 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | 18 June 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2006 | 06 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2006 | 18 January 2007 | 21 days late | |
Annual return | 28 February 2005 | 30 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2004 | 07 January 2005 | 9 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window