Governing document GILLING CASTLE GOLF CLUB

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 21 FEBRUARY 2000 25 FEBRUARY 2002 AND 9 SEPTEMBER 2002 as amended on 11 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING GOLF. 2. SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE GRANTING OF DONATIONS TO OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES.
Area of benefit
RYEDALE, HAMBLETON, YORK, NORTH YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.