Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ASHFORD CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1096817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £1.84k £1.79k £148 £1.53k £1.69k
Total expenditure £4.09k £95 £8.00k £175 £2.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A