Financial history DEAL PATHFINDERS CLUB

Charity number: 1093536
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2010 31/01/2011 31/01/2012 31/01/2013 31/01/2014
Total gross income £11.33k £12.39k £8.45k £10.29k £9.51k
Total expenditure £9.96k £11.68k £9.13k £11.41k £8.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A