Financial history THE BENJAMIN TRUST

Charity Number: 1092348
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £23.63k £18.71k £19.73k £24.36k £20.17k
Total expenditure £34.30k £21.77k £24.51k £30.91k £429.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A