Financial history Lyonsdown Church Partnership Trust

Charity number: 1094089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £117.98k £156.19k £155.17k £203.72k £195.78k
Total expenditure £181.26k £206.68k £240.59k £188.31k £208.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A