Accounts and annual returns THE SIKH SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1095172
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 30 October 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 October 2014 25 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2013 15 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2013 Not Required