Financial history CIRENCESTER ROUND TABLE NUMBER 286

Charity Number: 1093144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £10.20k £3.98k £12.15k £11.62k £8.11k
Total expenditure £8.50k £2.21k £10.61k £7.84k £10.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A