Financial history POULTON RESEARCH PROJECT LIMITED

Charity Number: 1094552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £17.69k £6.32k £12.36k £21.17k £21.25k
Total expenditure £14.24k £2.81k £14.39k £22.87k £5.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A