Financial history PROJECTS AIDING GAMBIAN EDUCATION & NATURAL TALENT (PAGEANT)

Charity number: 1093963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.75k £12.11k £19.91k £7.81k £57.21k
Total expenditure £23.89k £30.22k £33.52k £24.72k £42.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A