Accounts and annual returns FUN HOUSE

Charity number: 1094340
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 22 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2012 10 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2011 12 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2010 26 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2010 Not Required