Accounts and annual returns SLOUGH E LEARNING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1093541
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2007 06 May 2008 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2007 06 May 2008 67 days late
Annual return 30 April 2006 23 March 2007 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2006 23 March 2007 23 days late
Annual return 30 April 2005 08 June 2006 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2005 08 June 2006 100 days late
Annual return 30 April 2004 11 March 2005 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2004 11 March 2005 11 days late