Financial history THE STUART TAYLOR TRUST FOR YOUTH DISCIPLESHIP

Charity number: 1094312
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016 30/06/2017
Total gross income £203 £186 £417 £265 £218
Total expenditure £0 £520 £0 £325 £40
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A