Accounts and annual returns CALVARY CHAPEL TWICKENHAM LIMITED

Charity Number: 1095289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 26 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 26 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 27 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 20 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 20 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 06 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 06 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window