Financial history EVANS CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity Number: 1096739
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £320 £60 £13 £508 £1.39k
Total expenditure £26.54k £11.04k £15.60k £13.59k £8.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A