Financial history RELATE NORTH HERTFORDSHIRE & STEVENAGE

Charity Number: 1093393
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £175.69k £139.54k £144.32k £129.57k £110.68k
Total expenditure £141.81k £141.56k £143.45k £144.95k £141.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A