Accounts and annual returns HANOVER IN HACKNEY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1093968
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 28 January 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 15 September 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 27 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 27 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 03 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 September 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 05 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time