Accounts and annual returns FAIR MOBILITY

Charity Number: 1094144
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2008 31 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 31 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 20 April 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 26 September 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 30 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 31 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 01 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 02 November 2006 2 days late