Accounts and annual returns WALSALL SHOP MOBILITY

Charity number: 1094731
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2009 06 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2008 20 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2007 15 April 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 15 April 2008 On Time