Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF FIR BANK

Charity number: 1094035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 14 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 29 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required