Trustees BURNHAM GRAMMAR SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1094537

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ANDREW JAMES GILLESPIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew Gordon-Smith | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dylan Featherstone | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Trehy | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bainbridge | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CRAIG BURROWS | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CATHCART | Trustee | 22 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHIRLEY FOSTER | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW FRITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.