Financial history CHORLEY MUSLIM TRUST

Charity number: 1094319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £27.22k £165.09k £53.97k £32.27k £38.29k
Total expenditure £23.85k £139.71k £26.32k £35.22k £42.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.97k N/A N/A N/A