Accounts and annual returns THE TUNSTALL VIEW TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1094133
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2008 06 April 2009 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2007 11 May 2008 163 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2006 18 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not Required
Annual return 19 March 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 19 March 2005 Not submitted