Accounts and annual returns THE CASA AZUL TRUST

Charity Number: 1095027
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 15 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 01 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 12 November 2007 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 31 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 24 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 24 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 30 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 30 September 2005 On Time