Financial history LOCAL CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY (VAUXHALL)

Charity number: 1100863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £209.86k £306.25k £328.19k £334.81k £372.12k
Total expenditure £166.20k £166.13k £153.68k £201.59k £249.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A